MO SCR50 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the U.S. Congress to replace the statue of Thomas Hart Benton in the Statuary Hall of the U.S. Capitol with a statue of Harry S Truman
Title
Requests the U.S. Congress to replace the statue of Thomas Hart Benton in the Statuary Hall of the U.S. Capitol with a statue of Harry S Truman
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: SCR 50 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SCR 50 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 124 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SCR 50 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 124 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-13 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-18 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-16 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-16 | House | H Second Read |
2018-05-15 | House | H First Read |
2018-05-15 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 50-Hegeman |