MS HB1568 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration, With The Approval Of The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning, Acting On Behalf Of Jackson State University, To Expand The Legal Physical Boundaries Of The Flagship Campus Of Jackson State University, Located At 1400 John R. Lynch Street In Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Jackson State University; authorize to expand physical boundaries to promote safety on campus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges |
2024-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | Passed |
2024-03-08 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-03-05 | House | DR - TSDPCS: AP To UC |
2024-02-28 | House | DR - TSDPCS: UC To AP |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations A |