MS SB2374 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 57-89-3 And 57-89-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Costs Paid By A Motion Picture Production Company For Employee Benefits That Are Not Subject To State Income Tax In The Calculation Of Rebates Under The Mississippi Motion Picture Incentive Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Motion Picture Incentive Act; include employee benefits not subject to state income tax in rebate calculation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Smith (39th),Martinson,Mayo |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Polk,Burton |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Amended |
2014-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |