MS SB3015 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Partially Vetoed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Partially Vetoed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Additional Appropriation Of General Funds, Capital Expense Funds, Budget Contingency Funds And Special Funds To Defray The Expenses Of Various Agencies For Fiscal Years 2017 And 2018 And Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; additional appropriations for various state agencies for FY 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 102 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 102 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Partially Vetoed By Governor | |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-27 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-26 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-26 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Read,Barker,Huddleston (15th) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Burton |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-13 | House | Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |