MT SB497 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise property laws relating to easements
Title
Revise property laws relating to easements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed (Y: 14 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed (Y: 14 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2023-03-01 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-02-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-02-13 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-02-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |