NC S157 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-06 - Ch. SL 2023-13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-06 - Ch. SL 2023-13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limited Provisional License Modification
Title
Limited Provisional License Modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - A1 Logan Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2023-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - A2 Logan Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - A2 Logan Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-06 | Ch. SL 2023-13 | |
2023-05-06 | Senate | Became Law W/o Signature |
2023-04-25 | Pres. To Gov. 4/25/2023 | |
2023-04-24 | Ratified | |
2023-04-20 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-20 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2023-04-20 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2023-04-20 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-04-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-28 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-21 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H261 (Same As) 2023-03-06 - Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Chaptered
Dmv
Drivers Licenses
Id Systems
Licenses & Permits
Motor Vehicles
Presented
Public
Ratified
Session Laws
Dmv
Drivers Licenses
Id Systems
Licenses & Permits
Motor Vehicles
Presented
Public
Ratified
Session Laws
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 11 | (n/a) | Citation Text |