ND SCR4012 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 15 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 15 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to rescind all extant applications by the North Dakota Legislative Assembly to call a convention to propose amendments to the United States Constitution, under Article V of the United States Constitution.
Title
A concurrent resolution to rescind all extant applications by the North Dakota Legislative Assembly to call a convention to propose amendments to the United States Constitution, under Article V of the United States Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Senate | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 15 nays 31 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 1 1 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to State and Local Government |