NH HB647 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting convictions for simple assault from an extended term of imprisonment and relative to annulments of certain criminal convictions.
Title
Exempting convictions for simple assault from an extended term of imprisonment and relative to annulments of certain criminal convictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-03-11 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 855 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 418 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 233 |