NH SB600 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Executive Session: 05/08/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Executive Session: 05/08/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the board of pharmacy and certified public accountant examinations.
Title
Relative to the board of pharmacy and certified public accountant examinations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 05/08/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 10 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1000s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1000s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1000s, 03/21/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing: 02/21/2024, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am, on proposed non-germane amendment # 2024-0687s; Senate Calendar 8 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Introduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 3 |