NJ A2940 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5617
Note: Carry Over of previous S4033
Note: Carry Over of previous S4033
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum Medicaid and NJ FamilyCare reimbursement rate for pediatric special care nursing facilities.
Title
Establishes minimum Medicaid and NJ FamilyCare reimbursement rate for pediatric special care nursing facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Robert Auth [R] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Rep. Reginald Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5617 (Carry Over) 2023-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S4033 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2472 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S4033 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2472 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee