NJ A3939 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates access to periodic cancer screening examinations for professional firefighters not enrolled in SHBP, but who are eligible for SHBP by virtue of public employment.
Title
Mandates access to periodic cancer screening examinations for professional firefighters not enrolled in SHBP, but who are eligible for SHBP by virtue of public employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2890 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2890 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2890 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2890 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - Substituted by A3939