NJ A4321 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1498
Note: Carry Over of previous S942
Note: Carry Over of previous S942
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits late penalties from being made against senior citizen tenants in certain senior citizen rental housing in certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits late penalties from being made against senior citizen tenants in certain senior citizen rental housing in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2400 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1498 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S942 (Carry Over) 2023-05-22 - Substituted by A1498 (1R)
A1498 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S942 (Carry Over) 2023-05-22 - Substituted by A1498 (1R)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A4321 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4500/4321_I1.HTM |