NJ S1017 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1624
Note: Carry Over of previous A2818
Note: Carry Over of previous A2818
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes right of sexual assault victim to notification of certain developments in criminal case.
Title
Establishes right of sexual assault victim to notification of certain developments in criminal case.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1624 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2818 (Carry Over) 2022-10-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A3748 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A2818 (Carry Over) 2022-10-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A3748 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee