NJ S2504 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4068
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Medicaid reimbursement rates for certain primary and mental health care services match reimbursement rates under Medicare.
Title
Requires Medicaid reimbursement rates for certain primary and mental health care services match reimbursement rates under Medicare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4068 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3937 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
A3937 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee