NJ S3177 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4398
Note: Carry Over of previous S2963
Note: Carry Over of previous S2963
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes fringe benefit rate for State public higher education institutions; requires employer pay for health care benefits for certain part-time faculty.
Title
Establishes fringe benefit rate for State public higher education institutions; requires employer pay for health care benefits for certain part-time faculty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3118 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4398 (Carry Over) 2022-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
S2963 (Carry Over) 2022-08-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A4398 (Carry Over) 2022-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
S2963 (Carry Over) 2022-08-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S3177 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3500/3177_I1.HTM |