NJ S3603 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2261
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits BPU review and approval of property transactions of certain telecommunications companies.
Title
Prohibits BPU review and approval of property transactions of certain telecommunications companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1778 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A1778 (1R) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-0) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1778 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3603 (1R)
A2261 (Carry Over) 2014-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee
A2261 (Carry Over) 2014-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee