NJ S3614 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1207
Note: Carry Foward to future A3086
Note: Carry Foward to future A3086
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to pay full cost of health care benefits coverage in retirement for SPRS members who retire at mandatory retirement age of 55 with more than 20 but less than 25 years of service.**
Title
Requires State to pay full cost of health care benefits coverage in retirement for SPRS members who retire at mandatory retirement age of 55 with more than 20 but less than 25 years of service.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5316 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5316 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-4) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (61-5-2) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A5316 (2R) |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-5) |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3614 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-4)
S3614 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-4)
A5316 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3614 (2R)
S3614 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-4)
A5316 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3614 (2R)