NJ SCR98 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR142
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR112
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR112
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Substituted by ACR105 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Substituted by ACR105 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reconstitutes the "Joint Committee on Economic Justice and Equal Employment Opportunity."
Title
Reconstitutes the "Joint Committee on Economic Justice and Equal Employment Opportunity."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | Substituted by ACR105 (1R) |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR105 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
ACR142 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
SCR112 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by ACR142
ACR142 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
SCR112 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by ACR142