NM HB2 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - [LD 4] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 3(partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - [LD 4] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 3(partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax, Fund & Distribution Changes
Title
Tax, Fund & Distribution Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | [LD 4] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 3(partial veto). |
2017-05-26 | House | [LD 3] h and then to cncrd |
2017-05-27 | Senate | [LD 4] Passed Senate (32-7) |
2017-05-27 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-05-26 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-05-26 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-05-25 | House | [LD 2] Passed House (37-29) |
2017-05-24 | House | [LD 1] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2017-05-24 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |