NM HB231 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Terminate Information Technology Commission
Title
Terminate Information Technology Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | House | [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 45 |
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (58-2) |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-19 | House | [LD 3] HSIVC |
2017-01-19 | House | [LD 3] HSIVC and then to House Transportation & Public Works |