NM HB239 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 49 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 49 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cannabis As Prison Contraband
Title
Cannabis As Prison Contraband
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 49 - Mar. 4 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:32 N:3 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:57 N:4 |
2024-02-08 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2024-02-02 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2024-01-24 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |