NM HB628 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 47] Passed Senate (39-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.191.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 47] Passed Senate (39-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.191.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public peace, health, safety & welfare
Title
Public peace, health, safety & welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 51 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 51 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Senate | [LD 47] Passed Senate (39-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.191. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Passed House (51-15) |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Assigned to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-02-15 | House | [LD 24] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2013-02-15 | House | [LD 24] Not Printed |