NM HB78 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety employee contribution payments
Title
Public safety employee contribution payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Passed House (59-0) |
2015-02-20 | House | [LD 24] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-20 | House | [LD 24] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-29 | House | [LD 8] HGEIC |
2015-01-29 | House | [LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HSCAC |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HSCAC and then to HGEIC |
2015-01-20 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |