NM HB90 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 20] Passed Senate (39-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 20] Passed Senate (39-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Storage Tank & Tank Tester Compliance
Title
Storage Tank & Tank Tester Compliance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | [LD 20] Passed Senate (39-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2018-02-08 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (60-0) |
2018-02-08 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Energy & Natural Resources |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Energy & Natural Resources and then to House Judiciary |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |