NM SB163 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - [LD 20] Passed House (66-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 11) Ch. 64 (partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - [LD 20] Passed House (66-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 11) Ch. 64 (partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Capital outlay reauthorizations
Title
Capital outlay reauthorizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | [LD 20] Passed House (66-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 11) Ch. 64 (partial veto). |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Finance |