NM SB87 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Engineer & Surveyor Requirements
Title
Engineer & Surveyor Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-01-30 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (59-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | Senate | [LD 12] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2017-01-28 | Senate | [LD 12] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |