NV AB223 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 472.
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 472.
Summary
Revises provisions concerning preferences for bidders on certain state purchasing and public works contracts. (BDR 27-857)
Title
Revises provisions concerning preferences for bidders on certain state purchasing and public works contracts. (BDR 27-857)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-08 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 472. | |
2009-06-04 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-06-03 | To enrollment. | |
2009-06-03 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint. | |
2009-06-02 | To printer. | |
2009-06-01 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-06-01 | From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 963 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | To committee. | |
2009-05-31 | Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | Senate Amendment No. 963 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Amendment No. 963 not concurred in. To Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-29 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-29 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-29 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-29 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 963.) To printer. | |
2009-05-29 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-15 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-05-15 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-13 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-13 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-12 | To printer. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 10, Excused: 1.) | |
2009-05-12 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 593.) | |
2009-05-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-08 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-21 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-21 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 229 and 549.) To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-09 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-03-03 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=456 |