NV AB258 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental administration; requiring, with certain exceptions, a governmental entity to keep confidential certain personal information regarding donors, members or volunteers of a nonprofit organization; prohibiting, with certain exceptions, a governmental entity from requesting or releasing certain personal information regarding donors, members or volunteers of a nonprofit organization; making an appropriation to the Interim Finance Committee for allocation to the Office of the Attorney General to fund certain positions; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Enacts certain provisions governing the confidentiality of certain personal information of a donor, member or volunteer of a nonprofit organization. (BDR 19-605)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Assembly | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | To printer. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 8.) |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 841.) |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 133.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-07 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |