NV SB304 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for redistricting of election districts in Carson City and the Cities of Henderson, Reno and Sparks, contingent upon voter approval. (BDR S-731)
Title
Provides for redistricting of election districts in Carson City and the Cities of Henderson, Reno and Sparks, contingent upon voter approval. (BDR S-731)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-06-13 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | To enrollment. | |
2011-06-06 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-06-05 | To printer. | |
2011-06-05 | In Senate. | |
2011-06-04 | Assembly Amendment No. 804 receded from. To Senate. | |
2011-06-04 | In Assembly. | |
2011-06-03 | Assembly Amendment No. 804 not concurred in. To Assembly. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 12, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-30 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-05-29 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 804.) To printer. | |
2011-05-29 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-25 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | |
2011-04-25 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-22 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-20 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-19 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-18 | Read second time. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-03-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |