NV SB395 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 480.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 480.
Summary
Makes various changes regarding renewable energy and energy efficiency and alters the composition of the Commission on Economic Development. (BDR 58-1219)
Title
Makes various changes regarding renewable energy and energy efficiency and alters the composition of the Commission on Economic Development. (BDR 58-1219)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-08 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 480. | |
2009-06-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-06-02 | Assembly Amendment Nos. 909 and 965 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-01 | In Senate. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate. | |
2009-06-01 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-06-01 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-30 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-05-29 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-28 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-28 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 965.) To printer. | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-28 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-28 | To Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-28 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-27 | To printer. | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-27 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-05-27 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-27 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-27 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 909.) | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-27 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-05-20 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-19 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-19 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 664.) To printer. | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-11 | Rereferred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-05-11 | From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. | |
2009-04-21 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. | |
2009-04-20 | Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 388.) | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and rerefer to Committee on Finance. | |
2009-04-09 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-03-24 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1041 |