NV SB541 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 586.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 586.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enhances the criminal penalty for certain crimes committed against first responders. (BDR 15-1219)
Title
Enhances the criminal penalty for certain crimes committed against first responders. (BDR 15-1219)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 586. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 1044 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1044.) To printer. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 942.) To printer. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |