OH HB271 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-18)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3505.06 of the Revised Code to specify that state questions and issues appearing on ballots must be numbered consecutively based on the previous election.
Title
Number state ballot issues consecutively based on prior election
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | House | Passed |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2023-09-26 | House | Referred to committee: State and Local Government |
2023-09-18 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 05 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |