OH HB326 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 4779.02 of the Revised Code to add pharmacists to the professional license exception to the Orthotist, Prosthetist, and Pedorthist Licensing Law.
Title
To add pharmacists to the professional license exception to the Orthotist, Prosthetist, and Pedorthist Licensing Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-17 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-09 | Committee Report - A | |
2014-01-16 | To Commerce & Labor | |
2014-01-16 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-01-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-12-11 | Committee Report | |
2013-10-30 | To Commerce, Labor and Technology | |
2013-10-30 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 79 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 79 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |