OH HB423 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-14)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 5.076, 5.2532, 5.2533, 5.2534, 5.2537, and 5.294 of the Revised Code to designate the All-American Soap Box Derby as the official state gravity racing program, and to designate "Eugene 'Gene' F. Kranz Day," "Ohio Burn Awareness Week," "Ohio Public Lands Day," "Pollinator Week," and "Ulysses S. Grant Day."
Title
Designate All-American Soap Box Derby as gravity racing program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Passed |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Local Government and Elections |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-05-25 | House | Passed |
2022-05-11 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2021-09-22 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2021-09-20 | House | Introduced |