OK HB2625 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; relating to weighing motor vehicles; providing an exception to certain certificate requirement. Emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; relating to weighing motor vehicles; providing an exception to certain certificate requirement. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Brown [D] | Sen. Michael Burrage [D] | Rep. Tad Jones [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/07/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | coauthored by Schulz | |
2010-05-28 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-26 | 2 CCR read | |
2010-05-25 | To Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Russ, Brown, Roan, Walker | |
2010-05-25 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-24 | Laid over | |
2010-05-24 | House Rule suspended | |
2010-05-24 | Considered | |
2010-05-20 | Emergency added | |
2010-05-20 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-13 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-13 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-12 | Title restored | |
2010-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-03 | HC's named: Jones, Denney, Liebmann, Thomsen, Glenn, Sherrer | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Burrage, Coates, Newberry, Russell, Leftwich | |
2010-04-22 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-15 | SA's received | |
2010-04-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-24 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Business and Labor | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-03 | Authored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-03 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Jones | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 918 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 14 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 562 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 564 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 596 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 596 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |