OR HB4117 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 67, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 67, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Human Services to adopt by rule grant program to provide funding to culturally specific and responsive organizations, tribal governments and under-resourced rural community service organizations to conduct outreach regarding federal earned income tax credits and other tax benefits and to provide tax navigation and preparation services to low-income Oregonians. Directs Department of Human Services to adopt by rule grant program to provide funding to culturally specific and responsive organizations, tribal governments and under-resourced rural community service organizations to conduct outreach regarding federal earned income tax credits and other tax benefits and to provide tax navigation and preparation services to low-income Oregonians. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to services for low-income individuals; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 67, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 4--Findley, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Carried over to 03-03 by unanimous consent. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Ruiz. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 10--Boshart Davis, Cate, George, Goodwin, Hieb, Levy, Morgan, Reschke, Smith DB, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Breese-Iverson, Bynum. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-24 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-18 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |