OR HB5201 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 65, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 65, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allocates lottery moneys for support of redevelopment of Port of Port Orford Cannery Building. Increases amounts of lottery funds allocated from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to state agencies. Increases amounts allocated to state agencies from Criminal Fine Account. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Chapter 65, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016. |
2016-03-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, Shields, Winters. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 2--McKeown, Nearman. |
2016-02-29 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2016-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-25 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |