OR SB1583 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This Act does not allow a board or a person to choose or not choose materials that are used in a school when the choice is discrimination. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.5). Prohibits discrimination when selecting textbooks, instructional materials, program materials or library books that are used in the public schools of this state. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to access to materials; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Motion to Refer (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Motion to Refer (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-03-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2024-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 1--Anderson. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 12; Nays, 17--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Gorsek, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 1--Anderson. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng Minority) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng bill. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Motion to refer to Committee on Rules carried. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Woods. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |