RI H7129 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- OPEN MEETINGS - Allows school committees to add item(s) not appearing in published notice to their agendas for purposes of discussion only if the revised agenda is filed with the secretary of state and posted on district website at least 48 hrs in advance of the meeting.
Title
Allows school committees to add item(s) not appearing in published notice to their agendas for purposes of discussion only if the revised agenda is filed with the secretary of state and posted on district website at least 48 hrs in advance of the meeting.
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2024) |
2024-06-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-31 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-30 | House | House voted to recommit to House State Government & Elections |
2024-05-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2024) |
2024-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2024) |
2024-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7129.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7129A.pdf |