RI H7189 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Officers And Employees - Merit System (would Define A Veteran As Any Honorably Discharged Veteran Of Any Conflict Or Undeclared War Who Has Earned Campaign Or Expeditionary Medal For Such Service As Evidenced By His Or Her Dd-214)
Title
An Act Relating To Public Officers And Employees - Merit System (would Define A Veteran As Any Honorably Discharged Veteran Of Any Conflict Or Undeclared War Who Has Earned Campaign Or Expeditionary Medal For Such Service As Evidenced By His Or Her Dd-214)
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Peter Martin [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-18 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-11 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2012) | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs | |
2012-05-03 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on House Calendar (05/03/2012) | |
2012-04-26 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-04-19 | Scheduled for consideration (04/26/2012) | |
2012-02-02 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2012) | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7189.pdf |