RI H7513 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- CURRICULUM - Delays the date for local education agencies to select one of the high quality curricula and material for math and English language arts from June 30, 2025, to June 30, 2026.
Title
Delays the date for local education agencies to select one of the high quality curricula and material for math and English language arts from June 30, 2025, to June 30, 2026.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2024-03-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-03-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/26/2024) |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-03-15 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/20/2024) |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2024) |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |