RI H7652 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- LEVY AND ASSESSMENT OF LOCAL TAXES - Amends provisions relative to the levy and assessment of local taxes and would provide that the city of Providence may adopt a tax classification with unrestricted tax rates for certain classes of property.
Title
Amends provisions relative to the levy and assessment of local taxes and would provide that the city of Providence may adopt a tax classification with unrestricted tax rates for certain classes of property.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2024) |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2024) |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2024-05-21 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-05-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/21/2024) |
2024-05-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-10 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2024) |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |