RI H7822 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- BENEFIT DETERMINATION AND UTILIZATION REVIEW ACT - Limits the use by insurers of step therapy, a protocol that establishes a specific sequence in which prescription drugs for a specified medical condition are covered by an insurer, by allowing medical providers to request step therapy exceptions.
Title
Limits the use by insurers of step therapy, a protocol that establishes a specific sequence in which prescription drugs for a specified medical condition are covered by an insurer, by allowing medical providers to request step therapy exceptions.
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Jennifer Stewart [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7822.pdf |