RI H8030 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Scheduled for hearing (05/15/2024)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: May 15 House Finance Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Scheduled for hearing (05/15/2024)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: May 15 House Finance Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PARKS AND RECREATIONAL AREAS -- GENERAL PROVISIONS - Adds to those persons exempt from payment of parking fees at any recreational facility owned and operated by the state those individuals determined by the executive office of HHS, or its designee, to be disabled for purposes of Medicaid eligibility.
Title
Adds to those persons exempt from payment of parking fees at any recreational facility owned and operated by the state those individuals determined by the executive office of HHS, or its designee, to be disabled for purposes of Medicaid eligibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing (05/15/2024) |
2024-04-27 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/01/2024) |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8030.pdf |