RI S0784 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions - Agency Relationships In Residential Real Estate Transactions: would redefine "real estate" as vacant land or land with physical improvements consisting of a house or structure comprised of four or fewer residential units for the purposes of agency relationships in residential real estate transactions
Title
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions - Agency Relationships In Residential Real Estate Transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-30 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-28 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2011-06-27 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-27 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-06-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-24 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0784.pdf |