RI S0890 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables the town of Bristol to provide tax relief to volunteer firefighters based upon certain qualifying criteria.
Title
Bristol Volunteer Firefighters Tax Relief
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Firefighters tax relief (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Firefighters tax relief (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |