RI S0988 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Prp, Inc.
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Prp, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar |