RI S2152 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- COMPREHENSIVE PFAS BAN ACT OF 2024 - Enacts the Comprehensive PFAS Ban Act of 2024, prohibiting the intentional addition of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances of PFAS in products offered for sale or manufactured in the state as of January 1, 2027.
Title
Enacts the Comprehensive PFAS Ban Act of 2024, prohibiting the intentional addition of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances of PFAS in products offered for sale or manufactured in the state as of January 1, 2027.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2152.pdf |