RI S2635 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Proposed Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Proposed Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- ZONING ORDINANCES - Provide the maximum number of unrelated persons living together that could be constitute an individual household would not be less than one person per bedroom.
Title
Provide the maximum number of unrelated persons living together that could be constitute an individual household would not be less than one person per bedroom.
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2635.pdf |