RI S2937 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts two locations in the city of Providence from the objection provisions afforded to schools and churches as adjoining property owners of prospective liquor license holders.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-16 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2018-06-14 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2018) |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |